*This shortcut will teach us to multiply two 2 digit numbers whose tens digit add up to 10 and the units digit is same. For example, the following will make things clear for us.*

**(1) 16 * 96**

**(2) 27 * 87**

**(3) 34 * 74**

**(4) 42 * 62**

*Suppose we consider the first example, where the tens digit of the given numbers are 1 and 9 which add up to 10 and the units digit of the given numbers are same which is 6. The vedic method of multiplying the numbers is as follows:*

**(1) 16 * 96**

*(a) The answer has two parts LHS and RHS.*

*(b) The answer will look like LHS/RHS.*

*(c) To get the value of the RHS, multiply the units digit of the two given numbers. Here, it is, RHS = 6 * 6 = 36.*

*(d) To get the value of the LHS, multiply the tens digit of the two given numbers and then add the value of the tens digit to the product obtained. Here, it is,*

*LHS = (1 * 9) + 6 = 9 + 6 = 15*

*(e) The answer is = LHS/RHS = 15/36 = 1536.*

## No comments:

## Post a Comment