*This is my first posting on shortcuts in maths (SIM). In this post, we will see how to multiply two 2 digit numbers whose units digit add up to 10 and the tens digit are same. For example,*

**(1) 62 * 68**

**(2) 34 * 36**

**(3) 71 * 79**

**(4) 23 * 27***In all the above examples, you can observe that the units digit add to 10 and the tens digit are the same. Now, we all know the classic method of doing this since childhood. But, how do we do this in the vedic method. The process is as follows:*

**(1) 62 * 68**

*(a) There are two parts to the answer, which we call the LHS and the RHS.*

*(b) So, our answer looks like LHS/RHS.*

*(c) To get the RHS, multiply the units digit of the given numbers.*

*Here, it is, RHS = 2 * 8 = 16*

*(d) To get the LHS, multiply the tens digit of the given number by*

*one more than it. Here, it is, LHS = 6 * (6 + 1) = 6 * 7 = 42.*

*(e) The final answer as above is LHS/RHS = 42/16 = 4216*

## No comments:

## Post a Comment